Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jhpde Finance I, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Davenport, Esq, Christina W, against Vanek, James W, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HUNTER (ADMINISTRATIVE), SCOTT D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ALIAS REQUEST/CERT MAIL | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT FILED | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FILED | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF PLUS COSTS. | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.