Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Huntington National Bank, Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weinberg, Esq, Alexander C, against Jones, Theresa A, represented by Patel, Chandni, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HUNTER, SCOTT D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT SENT | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT FILED | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FILED | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.