Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Simco Management Agent For, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jordan, Samuel F, against Helfrich, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HUNTER (ADMINISTRATIVE), SCOTT D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DEBTORS EXAM FILED | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF PLUS COSTS. | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.