Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Harper, Latonya A, Mcdonald, Tonya N, filed a(n) Other Torts case represented by Tschantz, David M, against Mansfield, Ralph T, Ohio Radon Testing And Mitigation Co Ltd, Ohio Radon Testing & Mitigation Company Ltd., Ruehle, Janice, represented by Kmetz, Kimberlee J, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with SWEENEY, MAUREEN A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryOther Torts |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY
Date: December 28, 2022NOTICE
Date: March 31, 2023ANSWER OF
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE
Date: February 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | JE> SEE ATTACHED IMAGE | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.