Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Baker, Michelle, Copfer, Daniel D, Fitzgibbon, Brittany, against Verdecchia, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with SWEENEY, MAUREEN A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY
Date: December 06, 2022INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES ISSUED | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | JE> SEE ATTACHED IMAGE | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | JE> SEE ATTACHED IMAGE | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.