Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK NA -vs- KHOURY, KERRY L AD
On December 01, 2022 civil - common pleas case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. Judge DONOFRIO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 10, 2023
Filing Location
Mahoning County, OH
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE FILE CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FILED
Date: Jun 21, 2023JE SEE ATTACHED IMAGE
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE
Date: May 05, 2023MOTION
Date: Feb 15, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: Feb 15, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: Feb 03, 2023ANSWER OF
Date: Feb 02, 2023MOTION FOR LEAVE TO
Date: Jan 03, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: Jan 03, 2023COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY
Date: Dec 01, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT ISSUED AND FILED | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE TO ISSUE & FILE CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FILED | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | JE> SEE ATTACHED IMAGE | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAILER NUMBER P | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COPY OF COMPLAINT | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COPIES ISSUED | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-TECHNOLOGY FUND | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-SPECIAL PROJECTS FUND | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CV-COURT MEDIATION PROGRAM | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK COMPUTERIZATION FEE (CIVIL) | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT COMPUTER RESEARCH (CIVIL) | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | LEGAL NEWS | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | LEGAL AID (TOSCV) FILED | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED |