Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of Licking County. This case was filed in Licking County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2017 |
CategoryMarriage Termination With Children |
Last RefreshedMay 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLicking County, OH |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.