Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Licking County. This case was filed in Licking County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLicking County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | ITEMIZED BILL SENT LERNER SAMPSON & ROTHFUSS was sent bill for $220.90. Printed on 12/11/2013 16:22:43.44. | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE FILED. (WITHDRAWN) Receipt: 214045 Date: 12/26/2013 | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | MILEAGE FOR DAREL JONES Receipt: 214045 Date: 12/26/2013 | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
COPY OF ENTRY SENT TO PARTIES BY REGULAR MAIL AND/OR PLACED IN BIN COPY OF ENTRY SENT TO PARTIES BY REGULAR MAIL. COPY SENT TO LCSO. COPY TO ATTY DOVE IN BOX.(N) ENVELOPESent on: 11/12/2013 11:28:25.85 Receipt: 214045 Date: 12/26/2013 |
|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE SCHEDULED 01/03/14 Receipt: 214045 Date: 12/26/2013 | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEAttorney: ROTHFUSS, CARSON A (0000088636) | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.