Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rose M Evans, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mack Deborah L, against Allstate Insurance Services Inc, Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, represented by Glassman Thomas F, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with JODY M LUEBBERS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2023 |
CategoryH745 - Breach Of Contract & Jury Demand- Oc |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE SERVICES INC
Date: August 29, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 29, 2023DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2023NOTIFICATION FORM FILED.
Date: September 29, 2023CLASSIFICATION FORM FILED.
Date: August 25, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 29, 2023COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND FILED
Date: August 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FORM FILED. DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notification Form | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/01/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0996 2751] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/01/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0996 2768] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE ASSIGNED CASE ROLLED TO LUEBBERS/JODY/M PRIMARY | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE SERVICES INC DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.