Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Glen A Bosse, Tracey L Bosse, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gay Michael L, against The Home Depot Inc, represented by Yocum Thomas R, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with MELBA D MARSH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMELBA D MARSH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryH740 - Breach Of Contract- Oc |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notification Form | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FORM FILED. DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, THE HOME DEPOT, INC. DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO THE HOME DEPOT INC ON 03/27/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 5993] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE ASSIGNED CASE ROLLED TO MARSH/MELBA/D PRIMARY | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED TO THE HOME DEPOT INC [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 5993] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.