Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vidale Middlebrooks, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Taylor Ronald C Jr, against Abc Through Xyzz Property Management, Cincinnati Metropolitan Housing Authority, John And Jane Doe Property Maintenance, Ohio Department Of Medicaid, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with CHRISTOPHER A WAGNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryC310 - Other Tort- Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FORM FILED. DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY GRANTING THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL WITH ENTRY DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FORM FILED. DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT, CINCINNATI METROPOLITAN HOUSING AUTHORITY'S ANSWER TO STATE OF OHIO, DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAID'S CROSSCLAIM DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.