Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Onemain Financial Group Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Levy Yale R, against Stephanie Collins, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with TERRY NESTOR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTERRY NESTOR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryH861 - On Account- Oc |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT MONEY PAID IN BY UC HEALTH/COLLINS RECEIPT NBR: 231000014662 | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
INTERIM REPORT AND ANSWER OF GARNISHEE UC HEALTH/COLLINS, $807.59 DOCUMENT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | POUNDAGE | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT MONEY PAID IN BY UC HEALTH/COLLINS RECEIPT NBR: 231000014022 | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | POUNDAGE | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
INTERIM REPORT AND ANSWER OF GARNISHEE UC HEALTH/COLLINS, $867.83 DOCUMENT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID BY AND CHECK ISSUED TO: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC C/O YALE R LEVY | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEALABLE JUDGMENT SENT BY ORDINARY MAIL TO ALL PARTIES REQUIRED BY LAW. | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | POUNDAGE | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT MONEY PAID IN BY UC HEALTH/COLLINS RECEIPT NBR: 231000013354 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.