Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Howard Jerry R, against James Williams Jr Aka James E Williams Jr, represented by Minnillo Paul J, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with STEVEN E MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryH741 - Breach Of Contract- Oc |
Last RefreshedMay 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID BY AND CHECK ISSUED TO: JERRY R HOWARD | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notification Form | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.