Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
City Of Cincinnati, filed a(n) H710 - Appropriation- Oc case represented by Paul Shuva, against Ruths Place Llc, Ohio Epa, Duke Energy Ohio Inc, Us Dept Of Housing And Urban Development, Red Mortgage Capital Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Akhbari Elyse H, Randall Nicole R, Mclean James E Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with JOHN ANDREW WEST presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryH710 - Appropriation- Oc |
Last RefreshedMay 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | MONEY RECEIVED & COST PAID BY CITY OF CINCINNATI RECEIPT NBR: 153000004077 | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | SUNDRY ( CHECK ISSUED TO : ) CITY OF CINCINNATI C/O SHUVA PAUL (RETURN OF APPROPRIATION FUNDS) | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Filing | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT OHIO ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCYS FIRST AMENDED ANSWER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION OF INTENTION TO TAKE POSSESSION | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION FORM FILED. | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.