Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Ohio Department Of Job And Family Service, filed a(n) H702 - Other Civil - Taxed In Costs case represented by Casey Sean P, Barkan Neal Jonathan, against Ts Helping Hands Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with LESLIE GHIZ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryH702 - Other Civil - Taxed In Costs |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Judgment | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FILED IN HAMILTON COUNTY AGAINST TS HELPING HANDS LLC ON 01/08/2016 CJ16000156 | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FILED FOR COURT COSTS AGAINST 273.50 TS HELPING HANDS LLC | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE PNC BANK | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF GARNISHMENT DELIVERED TO PNC BANK ON 09/12/15, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0761 8926] | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Written Request | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | WRITTEN REQUEST FOR REGULAR MAIL SERVICE OF GARNISHMENT ON T'S HELPING HANDS LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.