Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Philip Yeary, filed a(n) H702 - Other Civil - Taxed In Costs case represented by Pro Se, against Ohio Adult Parole Authority, Indiana Parole Board, represented by Nestleroth Caitlyn A, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with ROBERT C WINKLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryH702 - Other Civil - Taxed In Costs |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Filing | |
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC EXCLUSION OF PRO HAC VICE ATTORNEY | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEALABLE JUDGMENT SENT BY ORDINARY MAIL TO ALL PARTIES REQUIRED BY LAW. | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Entry | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY GRANTING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Filing | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT INDIANA PAROLE BOARD'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.