Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
National City Commercial Capital Company L L C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cliffel Susan K, against Ramsgate Leasing Systmes Inc, Norm Cohen, Gregg Mcguire, Knox Machinery Inc, Nigel Mandel, (total of 6) See All represented by Croushore Paul, Columbus Michael T, Stich Carl Joseph, Mcnally John W, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with BETH A MYERS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryH740 - Breach Of Contract- Oc |
Last RefreshedMay 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Filing | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | MONEY RECEIVED & COST PAID BY WHITE GETGEY MEYER/FINANCIAL SERVICES/ JACOBS KLEINMAN SEIBEL & MCNALLY/WOOD & LAMPING | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Entry | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | ENTRY REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Filing | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF NATIONAL CITY COMMEMRCIAL CAPITAL IN RESPONSE TO GREGG MCGUIRES OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF GREG MCGUIRE IN OPPOSITION TO PLTF NATIONAL CITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CO LLC MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMORANDUM OF GREGG MCGUIRE IN OPPOSITION TO MEMORANDA IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GREGG MCGUIRES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF PLTF NATIONAL CITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL CO LLC AND DEFENDANT KNOX MACHINERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.