Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Board Of County Commissioners Hamilton County Ohio, filed a(n) H712 - Appropriation- Oc- Taxed In Costs case represented by Meckstroth John R, against Dusty Rhodes Auditor Hamilton County Ohio, Robert A Goering Treasurer Hamilton County Ohio, Vanessa Wong, David Wong, represented by Baron Lawrence C, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with DENNIS S HELMICK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDENNIS S HELMICK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2007 |
CategoryH712 - Appropriation- Oc- Taxed In Costs |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | MONEY RECEIVED & COST PAID BY CITY OF CINCINNATI | |
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OR PAYMENT PAID INTO COURT PURSUANT TO 163.18 SENT TO JOHN R MECKSTROTH | |
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OR PAYMENT PAID INTO COURT PURSUANT TO 163.18 SENT TO DAVID WONG | |
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OR PAYMENT PAID INTO COURT PURSUANT TO 163.18 SENT TO LAWRENCE C BARON | |
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OR PAYMENT PAID INTO COURT PURSUANT TO 163.18 SENT TO VANESSA WONG | |
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event | SUNDRY ( CHECK ISSUED TO : ) DAVID WONG AND VANESSA WONG | |
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Entry | |
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ENTRY AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | APPROPRIATION DEPOSIT BY CITY OF CINCINNATI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.