Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with SHERYL K MUNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2023 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 22, 2023COMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 19, 2023CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: May 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWERNAME - OF:MEGAN OSBORNEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JAMES ROSTATTORNEY ADDRESS:ROLFES HENRY CO., L.P.A. 600 VINE STREETSUITE 2600CINCINNATI, OH 45202(513) 579-0080 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWERNAME - OF:CLEANTURN INTERNATIONAL LLCPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JAMES ROSTATTORNEY ADDRESS:ROLFES HENRY CO., L.P.A. 600 VINE STREETSUITE 2600CINCINNATI, OH 45202(513) 579-0080 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILEDNAME:CLEANTURN INTERNATIONAL LLCPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JAMES ROSTATTORNEY ADDRESS:ROLFES HENRY CO., L.P.A. 600 VINE STREETSUITE 2600CINCINNATI, OH 45202(513) 579-0080 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILEDNAME:MEGAN OSBORNEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JAMES ROSTATTORNEY ADDRESS:ROLFES HENRY CO., L.P.A. 600 VINE STREETSUITE 2600CINCINNATI, OH 45202(513) 579-0080 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILEDNAME:CLEANTURN INTERNATIONAL LLCPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JAMES J BIRCHATTORNEY ADDRESS:ROLFES HENRY CO., L.P.A SUITE 2600600 VINE STREETCINCINNATI, OH 45202(513) 579-0080 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILEDNAME:MEGAN OSBORNEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JAMES J BIRCHATTORNEY ADDRESS:ROLFES HENRY CO., L.P.A SUITE 2600600 VINE STREETCINCINNATI, OH 45202(513) 579-0080 | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:05/22/23DATE - SERVICE:07/21/23NAME:CLEANTURN INTERNATIONAL LLC | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:05/22/23DATE - SERVICE:05/24/23NAME:MEGAN OSBORNE | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:CLEANTURN INTERNATIONAL LLCPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:ORIGINAL SUMMONS/COMPLAINTCERTIFIED MAIL NO:522808004465ADDRESS:1059 CABLE AVENUE STE A COLUMBUS, OH 43222ATTORNEY NAME:SEAN H HEFFERNANATTORNEY ADDRESS:MCCARTY & HEFFERMAN LLP 3783 BROADWAYGROVE CITY, OH 43123(216) 650-5917TIE FILING DATE:05/19/23RETURNED - SERVED ON 07/21/23 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:MEGAN OSBORNEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:ORIGINAL SUMMONS/COMPLAINTCERTIFIED MAIL NO:522808004472ADDRESS:1145 APPLE BLOSSOM LANE COLUMBUS, OH 43223ATTORNEY NAME:SEAN H HEFFERNANATTORNEY ADDRESS:MCCARTY & HEFFERMAN LLP 3783 BROADWAYGROVE CITY, OH 43123(216) 650-5917TIE FILING DATE:05/19/23RETURNED - SERVED ON 05/24/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.