Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with MARK A SERROTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMARK A SERROTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
1ST REMINDER NOTICEUS SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC
Date: December 13, 20221ST REMINDER NOTICERITA BACHMAN
Date: December 13, 20222ND NOTICE COST DUERITA BACHMAN
Date: January 19, 20232ND NOTICE COST DUEUS SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC
Date: January 19, 2023SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:08/15/23DATE - SERVICE:09/08/23NAME:BANK OF AMERICA
Date: September 12, 2023MISCELLANEOUS PAPERBILL SENT TO RITA BACHMAN RETURNED - BUSINESS ADDRESS
Date: December 07, 2022TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:22CV004309 SUPR CRT TERM CD:12
Date: October 24, 2022MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/12/22
Date: October 24, 2022DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR CASE
Date: October 24, 2022NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNOTICE PRINT DATE:10/24/22NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/24/22
Date: October 24, 2022NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: July 26, 2023ATTORNEY WITHDRAWALTIE FILING DATE:06/23/22
Date: July 26, 2023CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: June 23, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 27, 2022COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEENAME - OF:BANK OF AMERICAPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NGARN ANS DESC:NO DEPOSITORY ACCOUNTSCREDITOR NAME:CITY OF COLUMBUS DIVISION OF INCOME TAX | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT NOTICE SENTSYS GEN NARR CODE:050TIE FILING DATE:09/21/23NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/06/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:09/21/23 | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:08/15/23DATE - SERVICE:09/08/23NAME:BANK OF AMERICA | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT NOTICE SENTSYS GEN NARR CODE:050TIE FILING DATE:09/05/23NOTICE PRINT DATE:09/14/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:09/05/23 | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEENAME - OF:BANK OF AMERICAPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NGARN ANS DESC:NO EXISTING ACCOUNTSCREDITOR NAME:CITY OF COLUMBUS DIVISION OF INCOME TAX | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:BANK OF AMERICAPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:GARNISHMENTCERTIFIED MAIL NO:522808642056ADDRESS:C/O LEGAL ORDER PROCESSINPO BOX 15047WILMINGTON, DE 19580ATTORNEY NAME:THOMAS L SOOYATTORNEY ADDRESS:SCHUERGER LAW GROUP1001 KINGSMILL PARKWAY COLUMBUS, OH 43229(614) 674-6902TIE FILING DATE:08/09/23RETURNED - SERVED ON 09/08/23 | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:US SECURITY ASSOCIATES INCPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:GARNISHMENTCERTIFIED MAIL NO:522808642049ADDRESS:NKA ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECU1551 N TUSTIN AVESTE 650SANTA ANA, CA 92705ATTORNEY NAME:THOMAS L SOOYATTORNEY ADDRESS:SCHUERGER LAW GROUP1001 KINGSMILL PARKWAY COLUMBUS, OH 43229(614) 674-6902TIE FILING DATE:08/09/23 | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - ORDINARY MAILNAME:BANK OF AMERICAPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:GARNISHMENTADDRESS:C/O LEGAL ORDER PROCESSINPO BOX 15047WILMINGTON, DE 19580ATTORNEY NAME:THOMAS L SOOYATTORNEY ADDRESS:SCHUERGER LAW GROUP1001 KINGSMILL PARKWAY COLUMBUS, OH 43229(614) 674-6902TIE FILING DATE:08/09/23 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR OF GARNISHMENTNAME:US SECURITY ASSOCIATES INCPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DIND-WAGE/NON-WAGE:N | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING/EVENT SCHEDULEDDATE - COURTROOM:09/14/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 2B345 SOUTH HIGH STREET2ND FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:GARNISHMENTSNOTICE REQ IND:NNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - CIVIL DIVISION NOTICE MAIL DATE:07/16/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.