Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with Richard Frye presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
EXHIBITS
Date: May 10, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTSNAME:THOMAS LANEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: October 16, 2023RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:22AP358
Date: August 02, 2022TRANSCRIPT - REQUEST TO FILE COURT OF APPEALS
Date: June 21, 2022APPEALS DECISION COURT OF APPEALS
Date: May 10, 2023JUDGMENT AFFIRMED - COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:22AP-358
Date: May 16, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED - COURT OF APPEALSNAME:THOMAS LANEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P
Date: June 21, 2022MOTION RELEASED TO CLEAR DOCKETTIE FILING DATE:05/10/22
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBITSCD IN SLIP CASE
Date: October 16, 2023RESPONSE TO
Date: October 30, 2023JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: June 09, 2022MOTION RELEASED TO CLEAR DOCKETTIE FILING DATE:06/07/22
Date: June 09, 2022TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:22CV003051 SUPR CRT TERM CD:18
Date: June 09, 2022CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: May 06, 2022COMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 06, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTIONNAME:THOMAS LANEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PPRO SE NAME:THOMAS LANEPRO SE ADDRESS:4878 DORCHESTER STCOLUMBUS, OH 43125MOTION COUNTER:0004 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:GMAC MORTGAGE LLCPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:200 RENAISSANCE CENTER DETRIOT, MI 48243PRO SE NAME:THOMAS LANEPRO SE ADDRESS:4878 DORCHESTER STCOLUMBUS, OH 43125NOTICE PRINT DATE:11/07/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:11/07/23 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE - ORDINARY MAILNAME:US BANK NA AS TRUSTEEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGADDRESS:800 NICOLLET MALLMINNEAPOLIS, MN 55402PRO SE NAME:THOMAS LANEPRO SE ADDRESS:4878 DORCHESTER STCOLUMBUS, OH 43125NOTICE PRINT DATE:11/07/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:11/07/23 | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITSCD IN SLIP CASE | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGEMENTNAME:THOMAS LANEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PPRO SE NAME:THOMAS LANEPRO SE ADDRESS:4878 DORCHESTER STCOLUMBUS, OH 43125MOTION COUNTER:0003 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFFIRMED - COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:22AP-358 | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEALS DECISION COURT OF APPEALS | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:22AP358 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.