Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with Colleen O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeColleen O'Donnell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF
Date: January 04, 2021DISMISS AS TO CERTAIN PARTIES
Date: January 04, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: September 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:34.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6369959PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:KOKOSING INDUSTRIAL INC | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:GABE ROEHRENBECKJPAYEE ADDRESS:6235 WESTERVILLE ROADSUITE 200WESTERVILLE, OH 43081AMT- DISB/RFND:101.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6369959 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:225.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :124.00 | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:09/17/20DATE - COURTROOM:09/02/21TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4F345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:09/17/20DATE - COURTROOM:09/21/21TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4F345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISS AS TO CERTAIN PARTIES | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:20CV006133 SUPR CRT TERM CD:07 | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE SETTLED ENTRY TO FOLLOW | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILEDNAME:CITY OF COLUMBUS OHIOPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:ALANA TANOURYATTORNEY ADDRESS:COLUMBUS CITY ATTORNEY 77 N. FRONT STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 221-5100 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.