Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Professional Tort case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with ANDY D MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryProfessional Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:FAIZA YUSUFDATE - DEPOSITION:08/02/21
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:HODA YUSUFDATE - DEPOSITION:10/25/21
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE
Date: November 15, 2022AMENDED
Date: March 04, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: January 06, 2022MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:01/04/22
Date: January 24, 2022DEFENDANT DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: July 16, 2021DEFENDANT DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:STUART FINKELDATE - DEPOSITION:11/08/23
Date: October 10, 2023DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: July 20, 2021DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED
Date: January 06, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
Date: July 07, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:JABRIL YUSUFDATE - DEPOSITION:06/24/22
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEO DEPOSITIONNAME:FARDOWSA YUSUFDATE - DEPOSITION:05/05/22
Date: May 02, 2022DEFENDANT DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: July 15, 2021DISMISS AS TO CERTAIN PARTIES
Date: October 14, 2022ATTORNEY WITHDRAWALTIE FILING DATE:04/30/21
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:ANJANA SAMADDER MDDATE - DEPOSITION:06/21/22
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: September 10, 2020CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: September 10, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 13, 2021PLAINTIFF DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: July 19, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT FILEDNO. OF DAYS:0000NO. OF ALTERNATES:00NO. OF JURORS:00NAME:ROBERT ERTNER
Date: December 08, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:AYANLE YUSUFPAYEE ADDRESS:, OH 00000DATE - DEPOSITION:10/25/21
Date: October 08, 2021JURY DEMAND - DEFENDANT
Date: April 30, 2021ENTRY
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:ANJANA SAMADDERDATE - DEPOSITION:06/21/22
Date: June 17, 2022ATTORNEY WITHDRAWALTIE FILING DATE:04/30/21
Date: October 14, 2022MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/22/22
Date: August 30, 2022ATTORNEY WITHDRAWALTIE FILING DATE:06/24/21
Date: October 14, 2022ATTORNEY WITHDRAWALTIE FILING DATE:08/19/22
Date: October 14, 2022DEFENDANT DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: March 01, 2022DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONDATE - DEPOSITION:04/03/23
Date: March 17, 2023AMENDED
Date: July 28, 2022MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:12/12/22
Date: January 28, 2023AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 28, 2023COMPLAINT FILED
Date: September 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:ROBERT ERTNER M.D.PAYEE ADDRESS:, OH 00000DATE - DEPOSITION:10/31/23 | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:STUART FINKELDATE - DEPOSITION:11/08/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:DIRK E RIEMENSCHNEIDERATTORNEY ADDRESS:BUCKINGHAM DOOLITTLE & BU4277 MUNSON STREET NWCANTON, OH 44718(216) 615-7325NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:BRANT E POLINGATTORNEY ADDRESS:POLING LAWSUITE 350300 EAST BROAD STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 737-2900NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:FREDERICK A SEWARDSATTORNEY ADDRESS:ARNOLD TODARO & WELCH CO.2075 MARBLE CLIFFOFFICE PARKCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 324-4516NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JOSHUA F DEBRAATTORNEY ADDRESS:6281 TRI-RIDGE BLVDSUITE 210LOVELAND, OH 45140(513) 576-1060NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:DANNY M NEWMAN JRATTORNEY ADDRESS:THE DONAHEY LAW FIRMSUITE 200580 S. HIGH STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 224-8166NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:MARK D DEFOSSEZATTORNEY ADDRESS:THE DONAHEY LAW FIRM495 SOUTH HIGH STSUITE 300COLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 224-8166NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:TIMOTHY A SPIRKOATTORNEY ADDRESS:ONE CLEVELAND CENTER17TH FLOOR1375 E NINTH STCLEVELAND, OH 44114-1724(216) 621-5300NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:12/04/23TIME - COURTROOM:01:30 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 5A345 S. HIGH STREET5TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:STEPHANIE P FRANCKEWITZATTORNEY ADDRESS:6281 TRI-RIDGE BLVDSUITE 210LOVELAND, OH 45140(513) 576-1060NOTICE PRINT DATE:10/05/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/05/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.