Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JULIE LYNCH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2019 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AMENDED ORDER OF SALE
Date: August 23, 2019CASE INFORMATION SHEET
Date: March 15, 2019CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: March 15, 2019DISMISS AS TO CERTAIN PARTIES
Date: May 02, 2019NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE
Date: September 11, 2019MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:09/30/19
Date: October 02, 2019ORDER TO VACATETIE FILING DATE:05/29/19
Date: October 02, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 18, 2019ORDER W/ONE COPY ISSUED FR CO SHERIFF
Date: August 23, 2019ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF SALEDATE - SALE:10/11/19COUNTY DESC:FRANKLIN COUNTY
Date: October 02, 2019ORDER
Date: October 02, 2019COMMITMENT FOR TITLE INSURANCE
Date: March 15, 2019COMMITMENT FOR TITLE INSURANCE
Date: May 20, 2019TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:19CV002260 SUPR CRT TERM CD:12
Date: May 29, 2019DECREE OF FORECLOSUREACTION HAS BEEN SET ASIDE
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBITS
Date: August 23, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATIONAMOUNT:346.00
Date: September 24, 2019COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 15, 2019MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:05/20/19
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBITS
Date: August 21, 2019ORDER OF SALE
Date: August 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLIED - DAILY REPORTERAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:96.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6297183PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:TLOA OF OHIO LLCATTORNEY NAME:KIM M HAMMONDATTORNEY ADDRESS:KEITH WEINER & ASSOCSUITE 11001100 SUPERIOR AVE EAST CLEVELAND, OH 44114(216) 771-6500 | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:KEITH WEINER & ASSOCMPAYEE ADDRESS:4TH FLOOR75 PUBLIC SQUARECLEVELAND, OH 44113AMT- DISB/RFND:420.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6297183 | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:46.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6297183PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:TLOA OF OHIO LLCATTORNEY NAME:KIM M HAMMONDATTORNEY ADDRESS:KEITH WEINER & ASSOCSUITE 11001100 SUPERIOR AVE EAST CLEVELAND, OH 44114(216) 771-6500 | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLIED - FRANKLIN COUNTY SHERIFFAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:51.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6297183PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:TLOA OF OHIO LLCATTORNEY NAME:KIM M HAMMONDATTORNEY ADDRESS:KEITH WEINER & ASSOCSUITE 11001100 SUPERIOR AVE EAST CLEVELAND, OH 44114(216) 771-6500 | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | REFUND ISSUE PER SALE 10/02/19 WD | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SHERIFFS RETURN OF ORDER OF SALE - WITHDRAWNDATE - SALE:10/02/19COUNTY DESC:FRANKLIN COUNTYAMT - SERVICE FEE:51.00 | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:09/30/19 | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATETIE FILING DATE:05/29/19 | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF SALEDATE - SALE:10/11/19COUNTY DESC:FRANKLIN COUNTY | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.