Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with David C. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid C. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
JUDGMENT ORDER FOR FORECLOSURENAME:WELLS FARGO BANK NAPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PACTION HAS BEEN SET ASIDE
Date: September 02, 2014MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/05/14
Date: September 02, 2014NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNOTICE PRINT DATE:09/02/14NOTICE MAIL DATE:09/02/14
Date: September 02, 2014MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:09/22/14
Date: September 24, 2014MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:10/01/14
Date: October 01, 2014MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:10/10/14
Date: October 29, 2014LEAVE GRANTED TO FILE - ORDER
Date: October 29, 2014MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:05/26/15
Date: May 31, 2015MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:07/17/15
Date: July 20, 2015MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:07/16/15
Date: July 16, 2015ORDER TO VACATETIE FILING DATE:09/02/14
Date: July 20, 2015ORDER TO VACATETIE FILING DATE:09/02/14
Date: July 24, 2015MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:07/23/15
Date: July 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:10.00HOW PAID IND:CHECK/MONEY ORDERINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:5998634PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:WELLS FARGO BANK NA | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | APPLIED - APPRAISER FEEAPPRAISER NAME:MCCUE F MARYAMOUNT- APPRAISER:200.00 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | APPLIED - APPRAISER FEEAPPRAISER NAME:HAMBLETON MARGARETAMOUNT- APPRAISER:200.00 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | APPLIED - APPRAISER FEEAPPRAISER NAME:HART J GREGORYAMOUNT- APPRAISER:200.00 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment made to APPR & Clerk by Villas Rays per Sale S/D & Late Fee | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SECURITY DEPOSIT RECEIVEDAMOUNT - PAID:532.00HOW PAID IND:CHECK/MONEY ORDERRECEIPT NUMBER:5998634PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:WELLS FARGO BANK NAPayment made to APPR & Clerk by Villas Rays per Sale S/D & Late Fee | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL SENTAMOUNT:532.00REMINDER LETTER MAILED TO KAMAN & CUSIMANO PER SALE W/D & LATE FEE | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | APPLIED - DAILY REPORTERAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:186.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:5974083PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:WELLS FARGO BANK NA | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:20.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:5974083PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:WELLS FARGO BANK NA | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | APPLIED - FRANKLIN COUNTY SHERIFFAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:62.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:5974083PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.