Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dannemiller, Madeline filed a(n) Notice Of Appeal- Dr Div case in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with TERRE L. VANDERVOORT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTERRE L. VANDERVOORT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2022 |
CategoryNotice Of Appeal- Dr Div |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT FILED IN FAIRFIELD COUNTY AGAINST MADELINE DANNEMILLER FOR COURT COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00 (2022 CJ 00080) | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. DANNEMILLER, MADELINE was sent bill for $75.00. Printed on 08/11/2022 13:38:51.52. |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. DANNEMILLER, MADELINE was sent bill for $75.00. Printed on 05/03/2022 13:31:25.99. |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL... APPEAL DISMISSED, COSTS TO APPELLANT... SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGES CRAG BALDWIN, EARLE E. WISE, JR AND PATRICIA DELANEY... COPY TO ALL PARTIES. | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SPLIT CASES TODAY / SENT APPEAL TO STORAGE AND RETURNED TRIAL COURT TO THE JUVENILE DIVISION |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION OF APPELLEE TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED JANUARY 24, 2022 WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND PROPOSED ENTRY Attorney: KOVALESKI, WILLIAM (100347) | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF THE RECORD ON APPEAL AND COPY TO ALL PARTIES | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RECEIVED ENTIRE CASE FROM JUVENILE COURT TODAY WITH TRANSCRIPT |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY REQUESTING A FULLY COMPLETED DOCKETING STATEMENT BY MARCH 1, 2022 AND FAILURE TO DO SO COULD RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE WITHING APPEAL... COPY TO COUNSEL. | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND COPIES TO: JONATHAN GETSON, (ATTY FOR MOTHER) WILLIAM KOVALESKI (ATTY FOR STATE) KEITH BREWSTER, (ATTY FOR FATHER) MICKELLEA TENNIS (ATTY FOR CHILD), JUDGE TERRE L. VANDERVOORT, JESSE / JUVENILE CLERK, AND CA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.