Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tabler, Elena Elisabeth Marie, Tabler, Mackenzie Lee, Fairfield County Csea, Fairfield County Department Of Job And Family, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Lanning, Michael Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryEstablishment Of Paternity |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER (FAILURE) I RECEIVED THIS SUMMONS ON DECEMBER 22, 2021 AND WAS UNABLE TO SERVE MICHAEL LANNING FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: SEVERAL ATTEMPTS NO CONTACT OR CALL BACKS | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE RETURNED-iSSUED NOTICE OF FAILURE TO ERIKA FRANK ON MICHAEL LANNING FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: SEVERAL ATTEMPTS NO CONTACT OR CALL BACKS | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | POSTAGE | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RESTRICTED DELIVERY COSTS Issue Date: 12/20/2021 Service: ISSUING PAPERWORK ASSOCIATED WITH CASE Method: CERTIFIED MAIL FOURTH FLOOR Cost Per: $10.00 TABLER, MACKENZIE LEE Tracking No: 9414726699042153690287 |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SUBPOENA ISSUED ONE (1) SUBPOENA |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR SUBPOENA Attorney: FRANK, ERIKA (0095179) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT TO DETERMINE PARENTAGE, NOTICE OF HEARING, BUILDING PROCEDURE LETTER, AND SUBPOENA UPON MICAEL LANNING BY CSEA PROCESS SERVER. ISSUED COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF HEARING, ADDITIONAL NOTICE AND BUILDING ENTRY LETTER TO MACKENZIE TABLER BY CERTIFIED MAIL/RESTRICTED. |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/AFFIDAVIT OF HEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.