Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Reynolds, Scott, filed a(n) Complaint For Custody case against Brasmon, Destani, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2021 |
CategoryComplaint For Custody |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AGO COLLECTIONS SCOTT REYNOLDS amount sent to collections: 198.76 | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | A-R NOTICE TO PAY COURT COSTS (NOTICE 1) REYNOLDS, SCOTT was sent notice for $198.76. Balance: $198.76 Past Due: $198.76 Printed on 08/24/2022 10:09:33.34. | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. REYNOLDS, SCOTT was sent bill for $198.76. Printed on 08/24/2022 10:11:32.45. |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. REYNOLDS, SCOTT was sent bill for $198.76. Printed on 06/08/2022 10:55:18.95. |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF DISMISSAL | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION NOTICE | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED COPIES OF NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY UPON SCOTT REYNOLDS AND DESTANI BRASMON VIA ORDINARY MAIL |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER/NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REQUEST FOR INFORMATION RE: PATERNITY ESTABLISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.