Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carsey-Rick, Jodie, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ward, Robert R., in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with HEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
Category(Dr) Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedJuly 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE MAILED Carsey-Rick, Jodie was sent notice for $ 130.00 Printed on 01/13/2017 07:33:15.18. | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to Court of No Contact with Seek Work Coordinator | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entry for : objection to magistrate's decision/defendant's objection to magistrate's decision is hereby overruled. all prior orders in the above captioined case remain in full force and effect. |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Letter: |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted : MAGISTRATE DECISION HRG 6/16/16 CONTEMPT |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service (completed) Method : J Certificate of Mailing Issued : 05/12/2016 Service : Documents per Instructions/Precipe Served : Return : 05/13/2016 On : Carsey-Rick, Jodie Signed By : Reason : J Return of service (completed) Comment : Tracking #: cm1111111111100001087 | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Issue Date: 05/12/2016 Service: Documents per Instructions/Precipe Method: J Certificate of Mailing Cost Per: $ Carsey-Rick, Jodie 107 Ross St Apt E DELAWARE, OH 43015 Tracking No: cm1111111111100001087 |
|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service J-PCS Clerk's Certificate of Service (F) Sent on: 05/12/2016 15:24:47.16 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service (completed) Method : J Certified Mail PCS Clerks Issued : 04/26/2016 Service : Juvenile AD Magistrate Order Served : 04/29/2016 Return : 05/10/2016 On : Ward, Robert R. Signed By : robert ward Reason : J Return of service (completed) Comment : Tracking #: 9171999991703423071410 | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service certified on both parties, motion filed 4/15/16 and order and summons 4/18/16 J-PCS Clerk's Certificate of Service (F) Sent on: 04/26/2016 15:26:30.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.