Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Batun, Mohamed, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dodderer, Steven K, against Liban, Zamzam, represented by Grossman, Andrew S, Levine, Amy M, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with FULLER, RANDALL D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLER, RANDALL D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2021 |
Category(Dr) Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED BATUN, MOHAMED was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $61.96 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 03/15/2023 07:57:01.16. | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED COST DUE - NO RECORD | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - SEE ENTRY FOR COMPLETE TERMS Receipt: 307808 Date: 02/23/2023 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 307808 Date: 02/23/2023 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL Attorney: GROSSMAN, ANDREW S (0066905) EFILED | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 307808 Date: 02/23/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.