Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware County Board Of Commissioners, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Hochstettler, Aric I, against Heinlen, Daniel L, Heinlen, Gelene V, Huntington National Bank, represented by Kenter, Aaron, Stahler, Clinton P, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2021 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2021MAGISTRATES ORDER
Date: December 14, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 13, 2021RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 16, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 13, 2021INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2021DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: April 26, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2022MAGISTRATES ORDER
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: January 20, 2022NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2022CLASSIFICATION
Date: December 13, 2021PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: March 13, 2023MOTION
Date: September 16, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: September 27, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2022MOTION
Date: June 24, 2022COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: December 13, 2021ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: September 19, 2022MAGISTRATES ORDER
Date: June 27, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE
Date: April 26, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: April 05, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: January 20, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2022RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: January 18, 2022SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 05, 2022INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2022RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 16, 2021ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - UPDATE | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COST PAID - RECORD | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $538.95 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 04/14/2023 09:12:03.21. | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COST DUE - RECORD | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECK ISSUED FROM DEPOSIT TO.......................GOLDMAN BRAUNSTEIN STAHLER KENTER LLP (MAILED PRIORITY MAIL) (DELIVERED 4-5-23 PER USPS FILE TRACKER) | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUNDRIES CHECK ISSUED TO.........................DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT FEES POUNDAGE Receipt: 309947 Date: 04/17/2023 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO................CLINTON P STAHLER | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS W-9'S IN FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.