Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bennett, Daniel J filed a(n) (Pmc) Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with HEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
Category(Pmc) Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
Application for
Date: December 21, 2018Narrative Statement
Date: December 21, 2018Magistrate's Order Pc sent:
Date: February 01, 2019Motion
Date: February 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | The docket | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Indigent Guardian Transfer Receipt: 57168 Date: 03/18/2019 | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry Granting Applicants Motion to Withdraw Application Pc sent: Chad Heald, GAL, Daniel J Bennett, Esq., Adriann McGee, Esq. 3/04/19 JR | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Probate Case Closed | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Application and Terminate Guardian ad Litem Receipt: 56796 Date: 02/27/2019 | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED Event: PROBATE MINOR'S CLAIM & DISPENSE WITH GURDIANSHIP Date: 03/22/2019 Time: 9:00 am Judge: Kaiser, R. Lamont Location: Probate Courtroom 3/22/19 Hearing Result: P Vacated | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Magistrate's Order Pc sent: Magistrate's Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem for Minor Pc sent: Adriann S. McGee, Esq., Joel Carney, Lauren Carney, Chad A. Heald, Esq., GAL 2/04/19 JR |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Heard The following event: PROBATE MINOR'S CLAIM & DISPENSE WITH GURDIANSHIP scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 9:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: P Heard Judge: Kaiser, R. Lamont Location: Probate Courtroom | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem for Minor Pc sent: Adriann S. McGee, Esq., Joel Carney, Lauren Carney, Chad A. Heald, Esq., GAL 2/04/19 JR | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry Setting Hearing and Ordering Notice Pc sent: Adriann S. McGee, Esq. 1/07/19 JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.