Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Village At Polaris Park, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Delaware County Treasurer, Friedman, Ariane, John Doe Unk Spouse, Mortgage Electronic Registration, Ohio Health Corporation, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
STATEMENT OF ACCEPTABILITY
Date: May 23, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 14, 2019JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: April 03, 2019SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 26, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 25, 2019MOTION
Date: June 19, 2019NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER
Date: July 09, 2019JUDGMENT ENTRY DECREE OF FORECLOSURE
Date: July 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED COST DUE - NO RECORD | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT Receipt: 271640 Date: 03/27/2020 | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 271640 Date: 03/27/2020 | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 271640 Date: 03/27/2020 | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT (E-FILED) Attorney: TERMAN, BRAD J (0083974) |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Attorney: TERMAN, BRAD J (0083974) Receipt: 271640 Date: 03/27/2020 | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND SATISFACTION OR JUDGMENT (E-FILED) Attorney: TERMAN, BRAD J (0083974) | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFFS RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE PROPERTY NOT SOLD PER ORDER VACATING SALE Receipt: 271640 Date: 03/27/2020 Receipt: 272333 Date: 04/23/2020 | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATES ORDER SETTING ASIDE SHERIFF SALE Receipt: 271640 Date: 03/27/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.