Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Potts, Joshua Andrew, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hwang, Gloria, represented by Lerner, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with FULLER, RANDALL D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLER, RANDALL D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
Category(Dr) Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL NOTICE TO COLLECT COSTS MAILED Hwang, Gloria was sent notice for $294.22. Balance: $294.22 Past Due: $294.22 Printed on 07/15/2020 07:54:00.77. | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | 60 DAY NOTICE MAILED Hwang, Gloria was sent notice for $294.22. Balance: $294.22 Past Due: $294.22 Printed on 06/15/2020 07:48:45.84. | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE MAILED Hwang, Gloria was sent notice for $294.22. Balance: $294.22 Past Due: $294.22 Printed on 05/18/2020 09:49:19.71. | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL NOTICE TO COLLECT COSTS MAILED Potts, Joshua Andrew was sent notice for $ 164.21 Printed on 04/15/2020 08:40:38.77. | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED Hwang, Gloria was sent notice for $ 0.00 Printed on 03/16/2020 09:20:11.18. | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | 60 DAY NOTICE MAILED Potts, Joshua Andrew was sent notice for $ 164.21 Printed on 03/16/2020 08:38:22.45. | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - UPDATE | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | FILE UPDATED | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ENVELOPE Sent on: 02/24/2020 11:24:01.58 | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS JUDGMENT ENTRY JUDGMENT ENTRY ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES AND EXPENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.