Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Asbeck, Adam filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with HEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
Category(Pes) Estate |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Entry Granting Summary Release from Administration pc:
Date: December 21, 2016Application for
Date: December 21, 2016Application for
Date: December 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Sent to destruction - Paper File destroyed - Date:1/29/20 | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | The docket summary | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Indigent Guardian Transfer Receipt: 40039 Date: 01/06/2017 | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Probate Case Closed | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Entry Granting Summary Release from Administration pc: David Brehm 12/21/16 | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Application for Summary Release from Administration | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for Application to File Will for Record Only |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Last Will and Testament Signed: 12/21/16 | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Copy of Death Certificate | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Next of Kin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.