Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with Randall D. Fuller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall D. Fuller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL NOTICE TO COLLECT COSTS MAILED SMITH, KATHY was sent notice for $ 85.30 Printed on 05/15/2019 07:19:28.65. | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | 60 DAY NOTICE MAILED SMITH, KATHY was sent notice for $ 85.30 Printed on 04/15/2019 07:36:19.69. | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE MAILED SMITH, KATHY was sent notice for $ 85.30 Printed on 03/15/2019 08:07:39.46. | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED SMITH, KATHY was sent notice for $ 0.00 Printed on 01/15/2019 15:44:41.98. | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED SMITH, KATHY was sent notice for $ 0.00 Printed on 01/15/2019 09:41:46.94. | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - UPDATE | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS CLERKS NOTE NOTICE OF FAILURE NOT COMPLETED DUE TO CLOSING OF CASE |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL UPON: Method : DOMESTIC CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 12/12/2018 Service : MAILER ONLY Served : Return : 01/04/2019 On : Britton, Lora J. Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF SERVICE / CERT MAIL Comment : VACANT Tracking #: 9414726699042126787495 | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - UPDATE | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - UPDATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.