Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Durr, Jessika M., filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Durr, Sharon, Rucker, David M., in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with FULLER, RANDALL D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLER, RANDALL D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
Category(Dr) Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedJune 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - UPDATE | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NO CURRENT COURT COST ASSESSED | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT JUDGMENT ENTRY JUDGMENT ENTRY - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE, MOTION TO DETERMINE ARREARS AND MOTION FOR SEEK WORK FILED 3/10/2020 AND PENDING BEFORE THIS COURT IS DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND HEARING ON SAID MOTION IS HEREBY VACATED |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS Attorney: KIDD, TANYA H (0092957) EFILED | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ENVELOPE Sent on: 07/15/2020 14:44:10.23 | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT MAGISTRATES ORDER MAGISTRATES ORDER THIS COURT SHALL EXERCISE ITS AUTHORITY TO SUPERSEDE THE SUPREME COURT OF OHIO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AND SHALL PROCEED ACCORDINGLY |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT MAGISTRATES ORDER MAGISTRATE'S ORDER THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 7/10/2020 BY ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED TO THE 25TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER, 2020 AT 11:00 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled The following event: DR CSEA SHOW CAUSE scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 11:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: DR CSEA SHOW CAUSE Date: 09/25/2020 Time: 11:00 am Judge: ALLEN, JAMIE L Location: HEARING ROOM 1 - LEVEL 400 Result: DR DISMISSED | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ENVELOPE Sent on: 06/25/2020 10:59:16.66 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.