Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Morales Vargas, Mar filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
Category(St) State Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: September 11, 2012MISC MOTION
Date: September 11, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
COURT CERTIFICATE OF RELEASE OF LIEN PARTIAL RELEASE THRU CASE 14 CVE 03 223 |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO COLLECT COURT COSTS | |
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
SHERIFFS RETURN DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF RETURN ON MOTION/AFFDIAVIT/ORDER OF JD EXAM UPON DEBTOR MARIA I TEOS UNABLE TO SERVE - NO LONGER LIVES AT LISTED ADDRESS |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY ORDER IN AID OF EXECUTION FOR JD EXAM WITH HEARING DATE OF OCTOBER 5 2012 AT 10:15 AM VOL 394 PGS 168-169 | |
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
MISC MOTION MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR JD EXAM Attorney: GARFINKEL, GREGG D (0077691) |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO SERVE Notice to Serve Civil/Domestic Sent on: 09/11/2012 14:57:23.89 | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | STATE TAX LIEN FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.