Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Delaware County Treasurer, Piccolo, Antionette J, Piccolo, Phil F, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with KRUEGER, EVERETT H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: August 18, 2010JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: September 01, 2010NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER
Date: June 11, 2010MISC MOTION
Date: August 17, 2010JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: June 10, 2010MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 25, 2010ORDER OF SALE
Date: June 22, 2010STATEMENT OF ACCEPTABILITY
Date: April 16, 2010JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: May 11, 2010MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2010ANSWER
Date: April 12, 2010ANSWER
Date: January 14, 2010SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 04, 2010SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 19, 2010COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED COST DUE - NO RECORD | |
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY OF DISMISSAL - THE JUDGMENT ENTRY ENTERED HEREIN IS HEREBY SET ASIDE AND PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE SEE ENTRY VOL 312 PG 222 Receipt: 101897 Date: 09/07/2010 | |
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND TO DISMISS COMPLAINT Attorney: FEALKO, JILL L (0072545) |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION COSTS PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION COSTS Issue Date: 08/23/2010 Service: PROOF OF PUBLICATION Method: PROOF OF PUBLICATION Cost Per: $ 0.00 BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP c/o ATTY: FEALKO, JILL L P.O. BOX 5480 CINCINNATI, OH 45201-5480 Tracking No: PP0000000000100003225 |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFFS RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE ORDER WITHDRAWING SALE DATED AUGUST 18 2010 NO SALE BY THE DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF Receipt: 102838 Date: 09/23/2010 | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF SALE SEE ENTRY IN VOLUME 310 PAGE 222 Receipt: 101897 Date: 09/07/2010 | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | FAX FEE / ABOVE JUDGMENT ENTRY TO THE DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF Receipt: 101897 Date: 09/07/2010 | |
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
FAX FEE FAX RECEIVED FEE Receipt: 101897 Date: 09/07/2010 |
|
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
MISC MOTION MOTION TO WITHDRAW PROPERTY FROM SHERIFFS SALE (FAXED) Attorney: FEALKO, JILL L (0072545) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.