Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Delaware County Treasurer, Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, Rice, Scott A, Thoman, Sandy K, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with KRUEGER, EVERETT H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKRUEGER, EVERETT H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 29, 2009JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: February 04, 2010MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Date: January 29, 2010ANSWER
Date: January 13, 2010STATEMENT OF ACCEPTABILITY
Date: January 19, 2010COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO......................LERNER SAMPSON & ROTHFUSS | |
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 103185 Date: 09/30/2010 | |
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY OF ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL SEE ENTRY IN VOLUME 315 PAGE 320 Receipt: 103185 Date: 09/30/2010 | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY - IT IS ORDERED THAT THE TREASURER OF DELAWARE COUNTY OHIO DISBURSE TO KATHY NICOLOSI THE SUM OF $500.00 FROM THE CLERK OF COURTS MEDIATION FUND SEE ENTRY VOL 302 PG 118 Receipt: 103185 Date: 09/30/2010 | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY MOTION AND JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR APPROVAL OF PAYMENT OF MEDIATION FEES AND EXPENSES SEE ENTRY VOL 302 PGS 116-117 Receipt: 103185 Date: 09/30/2010 |
|
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY NOTICE THAT CASE HAS BEEN PLACED ON INACTIVE STATUS SEE ENTRY VOL 300 PAGE 292 Receipt: 103185 Date: 09/30/2010 | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 103185 Date: 09/30/2010 | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
REPORT FINAL REPORT OF MEDIATION |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ENVELOPE Sent on: 05/12/2010 08:36:20 Receipt: 103185 Date: 09/30/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.