Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Darling, Darla filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with KRUEGER, EVERETT H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKRUEGER, EVERETT H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category(Cj) Certificate Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT RELEASE OF LIEN Receipt: 152996 Date: 03/13/2013 | |
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COURT CERTIFICATE OF RELEASE OF LIEN PARTIAL RELEASE THRU CASE 11CVE080922 |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING OF CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT Receipt: 87931 Date: 12/31/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.