Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with WHITNEY, W. DUNCAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: April 08, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2007ANSWER
Date: February 04, 2008SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 02, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: March 05, 2008REPLY
Date: February 04, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS PREVIOUS COSTS DUE - IN COLLECTIONS |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (FAXED) |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
FAX FEE FAX RECEIVED FEE |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE MONDAY OCTOBER 18 2010 AT 2:00 PM SEE ENTRY IN VOLUME 308 PAGE 175 | |
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | COURT COSTS SENT TO COLLECTIONS | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL NOTICE TO COLLECT COSTS MAILED BUCKEYE FINANCIAL NETWORK INC was sent notice for $ 253.57 Printed on 04/21/2009 08:00:58. | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | 60 DAY NOTICE MAILED BUCKEYE FINANCIAL NETWORK INC was sent notice for $ 253.57 Printed on 03/16/2009 13:07:06. | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE MAILED BUCKEYE FINANCIAL NETWORK INC was sent notice for $ 253.57 Printed on 02/18/2009 11:03:18. | |
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event | TYPING CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT 09-CJ-47-128 Sent on: 01/23/2009 12:05:53 Receipt: 69696 Date: 01/23/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.