Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ketchum, Nancy K, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Gaffney, John P, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with KRUEGER, EVERETT H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: December 28, 2007COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2007JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: May 29, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO..............................FARLOW & ASSOCIATES | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY / SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL ENTRY SEE ENTRY IN VOLUME 216 PAGE 385 Receipt: 57883 Date: 05/30/2008 | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 57883 Date: 05/30/2008 | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY SCHEDULING ENTRY SEE ENTRY IN VOLUME 202 PAGES 100-105 Receipt: 57883 Date: 05/30/2008 | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 57883 Date: 05/30/2008 | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT Receipt: 57883 Date: 05/30/2008 | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | CIVIL / DEPOSIT Receipt: 49301 Date: 12/27/2007 | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | CIVIL FILING FEES Receipt: 49301 Date: 12/27/2007 | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM ANOTHER COURT CASE TRANSFERRED FROM FRANKLIN COUNTY COMMON PLEAS COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.