Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Kibler, Lueva P, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with WHITNEY, W. DUNCAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedJuly 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - SHREDDED | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS CJ ISSUED 08 CJ 45 082 | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE PRECIPE FOR CJ |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | COST PAID - RECORD | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO..................THOMAS & THOMAS | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL RECORD PAGES Receipt: 54651 Date: 04/04/2008 | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED FOR PLAINTIFF IN THE SUM OF $1,797.79 WITH ACCRUED INTEREST $1,274.04 WITH INTEREST AT THE RATE OF 8% FROM SEPTEMBER 13, 2007 AND COSTS VOL 211 PG 14 Receipt: 54651 Date: 04/04/2008 | |
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Attorney: OKRZYNSKI, SARAH A (076571) | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY UPON MOTION OF PLAINTIFF IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT CAPITAL ONE IS THE PROPER PARTY PLAINTIFF HEREIN VOL 208 PG 393 Receipt: 54651 Date: 04/04/2008 | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
MISC MOTION MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PROPERT PARTY PLAINTIFF Attorney: OKRZYNSKI, SARAH A (076571) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.