Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Hilton, Soloman, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with KRUEGER, EVERETT H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR
Date: May 14, 2009JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: November 20, 2008MISC MOTION
Date: November 14, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: September 23, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: May 14, 2009ANSWER OF GARNISHEE -
Date: May 22, 2009ANSWER OF GARNISHEE -
Date: April 24, 2008ANSWER OF GARNISHEE -
Date: April 15, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2007NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR
Date: April 04, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: February 26, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: April 04, 2008NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR
Date: April 04, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: April 04, 2008SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 26, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - SHREDDED | |
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO............................WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS | |
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO.................JAVITCH BLOCK EISEN & RATHBONE | |
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event | COST PAID - RECORD | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - O FIFTH THIRD BANK / NO FUNDS RECEIVED | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 87633 Date: 12/28/2009 | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Receipt: 87633 Date: 12/28/2009 | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON: Method : CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 05/14/2009 Service : MAILER ONLY Served : 05/17/2009 Return : 05/18/2009 On : O FIFTH THIRD BANK Signed By : P C Reason : CERT MAIL / SERVICE COMPLETE Comment : Tracking #: WA7160390198481432663 | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR OF PROPERTY OTHER THAN PERSONAL EARNINGS HEARING SET ON MAY 29 2009 AT 9:00 AM | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY ORDER OF GARNISHMENT FOR 0 FIFTH THIRD BANK SEE ENTRY IN VOLUME 253 PAGE 242 Receipt: 87633 Date: 12/28/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.