Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Beneficial Ohio Inc, Delaware County Treasurer, Driggs, Timothy L, Jane Doe Unknown Spouse Of Timothy L Driggs, Janet Doe Unknown Spouse Of Travis L Scarbury, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with KRUEGER, EVERETT H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: July 29, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: April 01, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: July 02, 2008ORDER OF SALE
Date: April 11, 2008STATEMENT OF ACCEPTABILITY
Date: January 30, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2007ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2008SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 27, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - SHREDDED | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS COST BILL |
|
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 61148 Date: 07/30/2008 | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO.....................LERNER SAMPSON & ROTHFUSS | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | SUNDRIES CHECK ISSUED TO.........................DELAWARE COUNTY RECORDER | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | COST PAID - RECORD | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY CORRECTING DISTRIBUTION VOL 222 PG 335, 336 Receipt: 61148 Date: 07/30/2008 | |
July 25, 2008 | Docket Event | MISC DEPOSIT COSTS AND DISTRIBUTION Receipt: 60908 Date: 07/25/2008 | |
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE, ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTING SALE PROCEEDS VOL 220 PG 88-91 Receipt: 61148 Date: 07/30/2008 | |
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event | COURT CERTIFICATE OF RELEASE Receipt: 61148 Date: 07/30/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.