Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lasalle Bank National Association, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Beneficial Ohio Inc, Delaware County Treasurer, Elisha, Adesegun, Elisha, Lucy, Highland Hills Homeowners Association Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with WHITNEY, W. DUNCAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2007 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
JUDGMENT ENTRY APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: December 24, 2007SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 26, 2007MISC MOTION
Date: April 01, 2009JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: April 03, 2009MISC MOTION
Date: February 03, 2009ORDER OF SALE
Date: January 21, 2009JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: February 04, 2009JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: January 06, 2009MISC MOTION
Date: October 01, 2008ORDER OF SALE
Date: August 18, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: June 09, 2008MISC MOTION
Date: June 06, 2008ORDER OF SALE
Date: May 19, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: October 01, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: March 19, 2008MISC MOTION
Date: March 18, 2008JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: February 21, 2008ANSWER
Date: January 15, 2008STATEMENT OF ACCEPTABILITY
Date: February 04, 2008ORDER OF SALE
Date: February 25, 2008RESPONSE
Date: January 09, 2008SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 07, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: December 24, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO................JOHN D CLUNK | |
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT SEE ENTRY VOL 267 PGS 201-202 Receipt: 82688 Date: 09/29/2009 | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND TO DISMISS COMPLAINT Attorney: WHITACRE, JASON A (077330) |
|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION COSTS PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION COSTS Issue Date: 06/02/2009 Service: PROOF OF PUBLICATION Method: PROOF OF PUBLICATION Cost Per: $ 0.00 LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION c/o ATTY: BILLICK, TIMOTHY R 4500 COURTHOUSE BLVD STE 400 STOW, OH 44224 Tracking No: PP0000000000100002134 |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFFS RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE SHERIFFS RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE ORDER WITHDRAWING SALE DATED MAY 19 2009 NO SALE BY THE DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF Receipt: 82688 Date: 09/29/2009 |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY WITHDRAWING SALE VOL 254 PG 104 Receipt: 82688 Date: 09/29/2009 | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
MISC MOTION MOTION WITHDRAWING SALE Attorney: HOOSE, ROBERT R (074544) |
|
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SHERIFFS SALE ON MAY 27 2009 AT 10:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.