Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bennett, Pamela L. filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with Spicer, Kenneth J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpicer, Kenneth J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
Category(Pes) Estate |
Last RefreshedJune 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Sent to destruction - Paper File destroyed - Date: 05/15/15 | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Indigent Guardian Transfer Receipt: 8477 Date: 05/31/2012 | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Entry Approving Account Pc sent: Randy Burchfield, Esq. via U.S. Mail 5/22/12-kdp | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Probate Case Closed | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Entry Approving Account Entry Approving PARTIAL Account Pc sent: Randy Burchfield, Esq. via U. S. Mail 5/15/12-kdp |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Cover Letter from Randy Burchfield, Esq. with Final Account for filing. | |
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Account Filed: ACCOUNT: Hearing Date: 5/16/12 Receipts: $320,043.74 Disbursements: $320,043.74 Assets Remaining: $-0- Receipt: 7930 Date: 04/27/2012 |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Oral Hearing Notice of Hearing on Account 5/16/12 @8:30 am. |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Account / Inventory and Notice of Hearing Certificate of Service of Accountand Notice of Hearing Receipt: 7930 Date: 04/27/2012 |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Deposit Receipt: 7700 Date: 04/11/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.