Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Treasurer Of Cuyahoga County, Oh, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Terrence Jones, against Comelbuilding, Llc C O Northwest Registered Agent Svc., Inc. Registered Agent, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with EMILY HAGAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryTax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDisp.Other |
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S DECISION. ORDER SEE JOURNAL. NOTICE ISSUED
Date: April 18, 2023CONFIRMATION OF SALE (PRIVATE PURCHASER) OSJ
Date: October 25, 2023CASE FILED: COMPLAINT W PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT
Date: December 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT DEBTOR NOTICE(53059138) SENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL. TO: COMELBUILDING, LLC 6545 MARKET AVE., NORTH, STE. 100 CANTON, OH 44721 SR |
|
February 15, 2024 |
JUDGMENT DEBTOR NOTICE CERTIFIED MAIL COMELBUILDING, LLC C/O NORTHWEST REGISTERED AGENT SVC., INC. REGISTERED AGENT COMPLETED |
||
February 15, 2024 |
JUDGMENT DEBTOR NOTICE CERTIFIED MAIL COMELBUILDING, LLC C/O NORTHWEST REGISTERED AGENT SVC., INC. REGISTERED AGENT |
||
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
WRIT FEE CS |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT AMOUNT PAID SHERIFF SF |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLERK TO HOLD SALE FUNDS FOR COST AND OR FUTURE ORDER OF THE COURT $34,983.74 OS |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSIT REQUIRED FOR COURT COST TO CLERK $403.03 SHERIFF SF |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
$230.69 INTEREST PAID BY SHERIFF, GIVE TO CLERK SF |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE REFUND TO CUYAHOGA COUNTY PROSECUTOR RF |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
TO COURT: 11/22/2023 ORDER OF SALE RETURNED ENDORSED ADVERT, & SOLD TO: NAJJAH COLLINS ........................................................................................... FOR $38,600.00 DATE OF SALE 10/04/2023 (SEE ATTACHED IMAGE FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS BY SHERIFF) CS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.