Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
James Truett, filed a(n) Workmans Comp. Adm. Appeal case represented by David J Steiger, against Bureau Of Workers' Compensation Stephanie Mccloud, Administrator, Warrensville Developmental Center, represented by Daniel A. Kirschner, Thomas M Saxer, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with HOLLIE L GALLAGHER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryWorkmans Comp. Adm. Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
|
Case Outcome TypeDis. W/O Prej |
CASE FILED: NOTICE OF APPEAL WORK. COMP ADMIN APPEAL
Date: October 25, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS FILED JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS 09/19/2023 - GRANTED
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFUND BALANCE OF CASE COST DEPOSIT TO SHELDON KARP CO., LPA CS |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
THIS MATTER CAME BEFORE THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE JOINT MOTION OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT, WARRENSVILLE DEVELOPMENTAL CENTER, FOR AN ORDER DISMISSING THE WITHIN MATTER, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO OHIO CIVIL RULE 41(A)(2). THE COURT, HAVING REVIEWED SAID MOTION, AND TAKING INTO CONSIDERATION THE DISCUSSION OF THE PARTIES DURING THE SEPTEMBER 13, 2023 FINAL PRETRIAL, FINDS SAID MOTION WELL TAKEN. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS HEREBY DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO OHIO CIVIL RULE 41(A)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF HAS THE RIGHT TO RE-FILE HIS COMPLAINT WITHIN ONE YEAR FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IT IS SO ORDERED. COURT COST ASSESSED TO THE PLAINTIFF(S). PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(51894570) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: DAVID J STEIGER DSTEIGER@KARPSTEIGER SR |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(51894569) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: THOMAS M SAXER MMONEYPENNY@AMER-LAW SR |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(51894568) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: THOMAS M SAXER TSAXER@AMER-LAW SR |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(51894571) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: DANIEL A. KIRSCHNER DANIEL.KIRSCHNER@OHIOAGO SR |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL PRETRIAL HELD ON 09/13/2023. COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES APPEARED. CASE DID NOT SETTLE AND TRIAL REMAINS SET FOR 10/18/2023. PARTIES MUST FILE AGREED JURY INSTRUCTIONS, JURY INTERROGATORIES, AN AGREED STATEMENT OF THE FACTS FOR VOIR DIRE AND ALL TRIAL BRIEFS FOURTEEN DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL. PARTIES MUST ALSO FILE ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO LATER THAN FOURTEEN DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL, BRIEF IN OPPOSITION DUE SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL. UNTIMELY MOTIONS WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED OR ACCEPTED. FAILURE TO FILE ANY DOCUMENTS AS PER THIS COURT ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS UP TO AND INCLUDING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS FILED JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS 09/19/2023 - GRANTED MO |
|
September 18, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION STEPHANIE MCCLOUD, ADMINISTRATOR |
||
September 18, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL WARRENSVILLE DEVELOPMENTAL CENTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.